EP4183249 - APPARATUS FOR FEEDING SMALL ANIMALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bruckner, Otto Brennerstraße 17 4040 Linz / AT | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Hübscher & Partner Patentanwälte GmbH Spittelwiese 4 4020 Linz / AT | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 22208037.6 | 17.11.2022 | [2023/21] | Priority number, date | AT20210050927 | 19.11.2021 Original published format: AT 509272021 | [2023/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183249 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4183249 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01K5/01 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A01K5/0114 (EP,AT);
A01K5/00 (AT);
A01K5/01 (AT);
A01K5/0128 (EP,AT)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜTTERN VON KLEINTIEREN | [2023/21] | English: | APPARATUS FOR FEEDING SMALL ANIMALS | [2023/21] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION POUR PETITS ANIMAUX | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 20.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006201434 (KUJAWA JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0045] - [0052]; figures 1-6 *; | [XDAI]US2007261641 (MANLEY-HOOD GLORIA L [US]) [XD] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11 * paragraphs [0039] - [0069]; figures 1-15b * [A] 7 [I] 3,4,10 | by applicant | US2007261641 |