EP4183919 - CELLULOSE SHEET PACKAGING MATERIAL WITH TRANSPARENCY OBTAINED BY COATING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intersac Parc Industriel Rue Saint Donat 27 5640 Mettet / BE | [2023/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGPINAR, Ramiz 6250 PONT-DE-LOUP / BE | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Littolff, Denis Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon 4A, rue de l'Industrie 67450 Mundolsheim / FR | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 22208341.2 | 18.11.2022 | [2023/21] | Priority number, date | BE20210005911 | 23.11.2021 Original published format: BE 202105911 | [2023/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183919 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D21H19/72, B65D65/42, D21H27/00, D21H27/10 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
D21H27/10 (EP);
B65D33/04 (EP);
B65D5/4204 (EP);
B65D65/42 (EP);
D21H19/72 (EP);
D21H27/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL AUS CELLULOSEFOLIE MIT DURCH BESCHICHTEN HERGESTELLTER TRANSPARENZ | [2023/21] | English: | CELLULOSE SHEET PACKAGING MATERIAL WITH TRANSPARENCY OBTAINED BY COATING | [2023/21] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'EMBALLAGE EN FEUILLE CELLULOSIQUE À TRANSPARENCE OBTENUE PAR ENDUCTION | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 03.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 31.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR3008392 (ACE PACKAGING NV [BE]); | [AD]CN112853816 (XIAMEN JIHONG TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | FR628956 | GB323302 | JPH0130188B | CN203753586U | FR3008392 | CN112853816 |