EP4371660 - METHOD FOR PREPARING A CATALYST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF METHYL METHACRYLATE USING CLARIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Röhm GmbH Deutsche-Telekom-Allee 9 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Röhm Patent Association IP Management Deutsche-Telekom-Allee 9 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22208496.4 | 21.11.2022 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4371660 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J8/00, B01J8/08, B01J8/10, C08F220/18, C09J133/06 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
B01J8/0015 (EP);
B01J8/005 (EP);
B01J8/007 (EP);
B01J8/085 (EP);
B01J8/10 (EP);
C07C67/39 (EP);
C08F20/14 (EP);
B01J2208/00575 (EP);
B01J2208/00584 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C67/39, C07C69/54 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KATALYSATORS ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHYLMETHACRYLAT UNTER KLÄRUNG | [2024/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING A CATALYST FOR THE PRODUCTION OF METHYL METHACRYLATE USING CLARIFICATION | [2024/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UN CATALYSEUR POUR LA PRODUCTION DE MÉTHACRYLATE DE MÉTHYLE PAR CLARIFICATION | [2024/21] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2024/42] | 10.06.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1476215 (ROEHM & HAAS GMBH); | [A]US2010160460 (SOTO JORGE L [US], et al); | [A]WO2019022892 (ROHM & HAAS [US], et al); | [XI]US2019099731 (LYGIN ALEXANDER [DE], et al) |