EP4207090 - A METHOD OF LEARNING A TARGET OBJECT USING A VIRTUAL VIEWPOINT CAMERA AND A METHOD OF AUGMENTING A VIRTUAL MODEL ON A REAL OBJECT THAT IMPLEMENTS THE TARGET OBJECT USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Virnect, Co., Ltd. 10-15, Hangang-daero 7-gil Yongsan-gu Seoul 04379 / KR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Ki Young 04379 Seoul / KR | 02 /
KORPITSCH, Thorsten 2320 Schwechat, Wien / AT | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | BCKIP Part mbB Siegfriedstraße 8 80803 München / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22208582.1 | 21.11.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | KR20210191588 | 29.12.2021 Original published format: KR 20210191588 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4207090 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V10/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
G06V10/00 (EP);
G06T19/20 (KR,US);
G06T19/006 (KR,US);
G06T15/10 (KR);
G06T15/20 (US);
G06T3/40 (KR);
G06T7/11 (KR);
G06V10/25 (KR);
G06V10/74 (US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06T2207/20081 (KR);
G06T2215/16 (US);
G06T2219/2016 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM LERNEN EINES ZIELOBJEKTS MIT EINER VIRTUELLEN BLICKPUNKTKAMERA UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERWEITERUNG EINES VIRTUELLEN MODELLS AUF EINEM REALEN OBJEKT | [2023/27] | English: | A METHOD OF LEARNING A TARGET OBJECT USING A VIRTUAL VIEWPOINT CAMERA AND A METHOD OF AUGMENTING A VIRTUAL MODEL ON A REAL OBJECT THAT IMPLEMENTS THE TARGET OBJECT USING THE SAME | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'APPRENTISSAGE D'UN OBJET CIBLE À L'AIDE D'UNE CAMÉRA À POINT DE VUE VIRTUEL ET PROCÉDÉ D'AUGMENTATION D'UN MODÈLE VIRTUEL SUR UN OBJET RÉEL | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 03.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US10762702 (DHUA ARNAB [US], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [XI] - WANG YUE ET AL, "A LINE-MOD-based markerless tracking approachfor AR applications", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, LONDON, vol. 89, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S00170-016-9180-5, ISSN 0268-3768, (20160801), pages 1699 - 1707, (20160801), XP036172697 [X] 1-3,10 * page 1701-1702, Section 3.1 and Fig. 2 * * Fig. 1 * * page 1702, col. 1, par. 2; page 1702, col. 2, par. 1 * * page 1706, Section 4.2 and Fig. 9 * * page 1705, col. 2, par. 1 of Section 4.1; page 1706, col. 1, par. 1 * * page 1701, col. 2, par. 2 * * page 1705, col. 2, par. 1 of Section 4.1 and Fig. 8 * * page 1702, col. 1, par. 1; page 1705, col. 2, par 2; Fig. 6 * * page 1701, par. 2 of Section 3.1; page 1702, col. 1, par. 1; Fig. 2 and Fig. 6 * * page 1703, col. 2, par. 2 * [I] 4-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00170-016-9180-5 | [I] - LI WANG ET AL, "Fully convolutional network-based registration for augmented assembly systems", JOURNAL OF MANUFACTURING SYSTEMS, SOCIETY OF MANUFACTURING ENGINEERS, DEARBORN, MI, US, vol. 61, doi:10.1016/J.JMSY.2020.12.017, ISSN 0278-6125, (20210119), pages 673 - 684, (20210119), XP086877252 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jmsy.2020.12.017 | [I] - STEFAN HINTERSTOISSER ET AL, Model Based Training, Detection and Pose Estimation of Texture-Less 3D Objects in Heavily Cluttered Scenes, COMPUTER VISION ACCV 2012, SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 548 - 562, (20121105), ISBN 978-3-642-37330-5, XP047027004 [I] 1-10 * the whole document * | [XI] - WANG YUE ET AL, "Mechanical assembly assistance using marker-less augmented reality system", ASSEMBLY AUTOMATION, GB, (20180112), vol. 38, no. 1, doi:10.1108/AA-11-2016-152, ISSN 0144-5154, pages 77 - 87, XP093035368 [X] 1-3,10 * the whole document * [I] 4-9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1108/AA-11-2016-152 |