EP4187603 - ESD PROTECTION DEVICE WITH ISOLATION STRUCTURE LAYOUT THAT MINIMIZES HARMONIC DISTORTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TYLAITE, Egle 81549 München / DE | 02 /
WILLEMEN, Joost Adriaan 81929 München / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Sticht, Andreas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22208826.2 | 22.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | US202117536253 | 29.11.2021 Original published format: US202117536253 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187603 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/02, H01L29/06 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H01L27/0262 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L27/0248 (CN);
H01L29/0649 (EP,US);
H01L27/0255 (CN,KR);
H01L27/0259 (EP);
H01L27/0296 (CN,KR);
H01L29/0692 (EP,US);
H01L29/735 (EP,US);
H01L29/7436 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ESD-SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG MIT ISOLATIONSSTRUKTURANORDNUNG ZUR MINIMIERUNG DER HARMONISCHEN VERZERRUNG | [2023/22] | English: | ESD PROTECTION DEVICE WITH ISOLATION STRUCTURE LAYOUT THAT MINIMIZES HARMONIC DISTORTION | [2023/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES DÉCHARGES ÉLECTROSTATIQUES AVEC UNE CONFIGURATION DE STRUCTURE D'ISOLATION QUI MINIMISE LA DISTORSION HARMONIQUE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013153957 (LIN KUN-HSIEN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0016] - [0023] *; | [I]US2018108648 (VENDT VADIM VALENTINOVIC [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125] * * abstract *; | [XA]US11011509 (ZENG JIE [SG], et al) [X] 1-3,6,8,9,15 * abstract * [A] 4,5,7,10-14 |