EP4374955 - MIXING DEVICE FOR POLYETHYLENE REACTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 14.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARCOS ORTEGA, Sara 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 02 /
BAI, Hua 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 03 /
WISSINGER, Raymond Gregory 6160 GA Geleen / NL | 04 /
MEGENS, Bas Eugène Hans 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22208841.1 | 22.11.2022 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4374955 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01F23/45, B01F25/10, B01F25/23, B01F25/433 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B01F23/45 (EP);
B01F25/103 (EP);
B01F25/1041 (EP);
B01F25/23 (EP);
B01F25/4332 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MISCHVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN POLYETHYLENREAKTORSYSTEM | [2024/22] | English: | MIXING DEVICE FOR POLYETHYLENE REACTOR SYSTEM | [2024/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MÉLANGE POUR SYSTÈME DE RÉACTEUR EN POLYÉTHYLÈNE | [2024/22] | Examination procedure | 10.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/29] | 10.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6054046 (NELSON WILLIAM R [US]); | [A]US6361688 (NELSON WILLIAM R [US]); | [A]US7097160 (NELSON WILLIAM R [US]) | by applicant | WO2010081684 |