EP4187801 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING DATA FROM MULTIPLE TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION POINTS AND OPERATING METHOD OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Hongsik 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jungmin 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
LEE, Junho 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22209502.8 | 24.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | KR20210166111 | 26.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210166111 | KR20220057390 | 10.05.2022 Original published format: KR 20220057390 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4187801 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/024, H04B7/08 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
H04B7/024 (EP);
H04B7/086 (US);
H04B7/022 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US);
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04L25/0224 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUM EMPFANGEN VON DATEN AUS MEHREREN SENDE- UND EMPFANGSPUNKTEN UND BETRIEBSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/22] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION APPARATUS FOR RECEIVING DATA FROM MULTIPLE TRANSMISSION AND RECEPTION POINTS AND OPERATING METHOD OF THE SAME | [2023/22] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL POUR RECEVOIR DES DONNÉES PROVENANT DE MULTIPLES POINTS D'ÉMISSION ET DE RÉCEPTION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/22] | 29.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SAMSUNG, "Discussion on group-based beam reporting", vol. RAN WG1, no. Prague, Czech; 20170621 - 20170625, (20170820), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1714511, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170820), XP051317286 [X] 1,2,11,12,15 * table 1 * * figures 2a-2C * * page 3 - page 6 * [I] 3-10,13,14 |