EP4198474 - TEMPERATURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | 29.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goyal, Saurabh 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Wadhwa, Sanjay Kumar 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
Abughazaleh, Firas N. 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
Kumar, Atul 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Richard NXP SEMICONDUCTORS Intellectual Property Group Abbey House 25 Clarendon Road Redhill, Surrey RH1 1QZ / GB | [2023/25] | Application number, filing date | 22209944.2 | 28.11.2022 | [2023/25] | Priority number, date | US202117644212 | 14.12.2021 Original published format: US202117644212 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4198474 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01K7/01 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
G01K7/01 (EP,US);
G01K7/25 (US);
G01K2219/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEMPERATURSENSOR | [2023/25] | English: | TEMPERATURE SENSOR | [2023/25] | French: | CAPTEUR DE TEMPÉRATURE | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007237207 (ASLAN MEHMET [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0043] * [I] 2,3,5-15; | [A]US2014314124 (ASH MIKEL K [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0034] *; | [A]US2020129770 (OPRIS ION [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 6A-8 ** paragraphs [0030] - [0067] * |