EP4231354 - IMAGE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 02.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | 02.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ISORG 17 rue Soyouz 87068 Limoges Cedex 3 / FR | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARACCO, Emeline 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 02 /
BOUTHINON, Benjamin 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | 03 /
FLAMEIN, François 38000 GRENOBLE / FR | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beaumont 4, Place Robert Schuman B.P. 1529 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 22209955.8 | 28.11.2022 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | FR20220001456 | 18.02.2022 Original published format: FR 2201456 | [2023/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4231354 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H10K39/32, H10K30/81 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H01L27/14603 (EP);
H10K30/81 (EP);
H10K39/32 (EP);
H10K39/501 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/34] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDSENSOR | [2023/34] | English: | IMAGE SENSOR | [2023/34] | French: | CAPTEUR D'IMAGES | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 29.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017078513 (CHANG HSUAN-YEH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0006] , [0050] - [0056]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2021036035 (CHANG HSUANYEH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0010] , [0039] , [0041] , [0042] , [0048] - [0060]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2021366966 (LI SHIPEI [CN], et al) [A] 1-14* paragraphs [0065] , [0082] - [0086]; figures 1-13 * |