EP4195306 - SPECIFIC POSITIVE ELECTRODES COMPRISING A SPECIFIC SALT FOR AN ALKALI METAL-ION BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.05.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUTEL, Thibaut 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | 02 /
TOMASI, Daniel 38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/24] | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 Bis Esplanade de La Défense CS 60347 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22210010.9 | 28.11.2022 | [2023/24] | Priority number, date | FR20210013210 | 09.12.2021 Original published format: FR 2113210 | [2023/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4195306 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/13, H01M4/62, H01M10/052, H01M10/0525, // H01M4/02, H01M4/38, H01M4/485, H01M4/505, H01M4/525, H01M4/58 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
H01M4/13 (EP);
H01M10/0568 (US);
H01M10/052 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/0445 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
H01M4/62 (EP);
H01M4/622 (US);
H01M2004/028 (EP);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M4/5825 (EP);
H01M4/623 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEZIFISCHE POSITIVELEKTRODEN MIT EINEM SPEZIFISCHEN SALZ FÜR EINE ALKALIMETALL-IONEN-BATTERIE | [2023/24] | English: | SPECIFIC POSITIVE ELECTRODES COMPRISING A SPECIFIC SALT FOR AN ALKALI METAL-ION BATTERY | [2023/24] | French: | ÉLECTRODES POSITIVES SPÉCIFIQUES COMPRENANT UN SEL SPÉCIFIQUE POUR ACCUMULATEUR DU TYPE MÉTAL ALCALIN-ION | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO9928984 (ACEP INC [CA], et al) [AD] 1-14 * page 2, line 11 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 21 * * page 8, line 19 - page 12, line 2 * * claims 1-3, 5-13 *; | [A]WO2011157958 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 1 - page 5, line 20 * * page 6, lines 6-18 * * page 8, lines 8-35 * * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 35 * * claims 1, 2, 5-9, 11, 13 *; | [A]WO2017067994 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 25 * * page 8, line 23 - page 10, line 7 * * page 12, line 4 - page 14, line 7 * * page 15, lines 6-30 * * claims 1, 3, 4, 9 *; | [A]WO2017067996 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-14 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 29 * * page 9, lines 3-12 * * page 10, line 1 - page 15, line 9 * * page 16, lines 11-31 * * claims 1, 4-9 *; | [A]US2017365882 (LUSKI SHALOM [IL], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0077] ** claims 1, 3, 12, 13, 17, 18 *; | [A] - D. SHANMUKARAJ ET AL, "Sacrificial salts: Compensating the initial charge irreversibility in lithium batteries", ELECTROCHEMISTRY COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 12, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.ELECOM.2010.07.016, ISSN 1388-2481, (20100718), pages 1344 - 1347, (20101001), XP027423660 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 1345; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.elecom.2010.07.016 | by applicant | WO9731401 | WO9928984 | WO0003444 | US6203944 | - Electrochemistry Communications, (20110000), vol. 13, pages 664 - 667 |