EP4375172 - AN AIR SUPPLY CONTROL ARRANGEMENT FOR A HEAVY DUTY VEHICLE COMPRISING A LIFT AXLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOLVO TRUCK CORPORATION 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEYAKAR M R, Amarnath 627859 Surandai / IN | 02 /
ANGADI, Sunil 580004 Dharwad / IN | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22210040.6 | 28.11.2022 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4375172 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62D61/12 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B62D61/125 (EP,US);
B60G17/0525 (US);
B60G17/005 (EP);
B60G2202/152 (US);
B60G2202/412 (EP);
B60G2202/415 (EP);
B60G2204/4702 (EP,US);
B60G2300/0262 (EP);
B60G2300/042 (EP);
B60G2300/402 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTZUFUHRSTEUERUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN SCHWERLASTFAHRZEUG MIT LIFTACHSE | [2024/22] | English: | AN AIR SUPPLY CONTROL ARRANGEMENT FOR A HEAVY DUTY VEHICLE COMPRISING A LIFT AXLE | [2024/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'ALIMENTATION EN AIR POUR VÉHICULE POIDS LOURD COMPRENANT UN ESSIEU RELEVABLE | [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US3178201 (RICHNOW JR ERICK G); | [YA]EP0075764 (BI MODAL CORP [US]); | [YA]GB2165500 (RUBERY OWEN ROCKWELL LTD); | [YA]CN201694021U (DONGFENG MOTOR CO LTD) |