EP4186607 - SHEET METAL FOLDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sucorema Subcontrato Fabricação e Reparação de Mãquinas Lda Zona Industrial da Carriça Lt 22 4745-312 Muro / PT | For all designated states INEGI - Instituto de Ciência e Inovação em Engenharia Mecânica e Engenharia Industrial Campus da Feup Rua Dr. Roberto Frias, 400 4200-465 Porto / PT | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSA PACHECO, JOSE ANTÓNIO 4480-012 MAIA / PT | 02 /
REGO PEREIRA, JOÃO CARLOS 4405-342 VILA NOVA DE GAIA / PT | 03 /
DUARTE OLIVEIRA, JOSÉ MANUEL 1675-189 PONTINHA / PT | 04 /
LOURENÇO REIS, ANA ROSANETE 4050-612 PORTO / PT | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Patentree Edificio Net Rua de Salazares, 842 4149-002 Porto / PT | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22210050.5 | 28.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | PT20210117608 | 26.11.2021 Original published format: PT 2021117608 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186607 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/04, // B21D5/16, B21D19/08 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B21D5/042 (EP);
B21D19/08 (EP);
B21D5/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLECHBIEGEMASCHINE | [2023/22] | English: | SHEET METAL FOLDING MACHINE | [2023/22] | French: | MACHINE DE PLIAGE DE TÔLE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/18] | 21.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19901794 (REINHARDT GMBH MASCHBAU [DE]) [A] 1-15* figure - *; | [A]EP1854564 (GABELLA MACCHINE S P A [IT]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0048]; figure -; claim 2 *; | [IY]EP2014381 (REINHARD FRANZE [AT]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0009]; figure - * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]CN104368641 (ZHEJIANG JINGGONG SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP3403738 (THALMANN MASCHB AG [CH]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0021]; figure - * |