EP4176785 - CLEANER HOLDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Namhee 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
NAM, Bohyun 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
HWANG, Jungbae 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
KIM, Jinju 08592 Seoul / KR | 05 /
BAE, Sehwan 08592 Seoul / KR | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22210222.0 | 08.05.2017 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | KR20160056462 | 09.05.2016 Original published format: KR 20160056462 | KR20160108641 | 25.08.2016 Original published format: KR 20160108641 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176785 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4176785 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/24 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
A47L9/0063 (EP,US);
A47L9/322 (KR);
A47L9/2873 (EP,CN,US);
A47L5/225 (EP,US);
A47L5/24 (EP,US);
A47L5/26 (EP,US);
A47L5/28 (US);
A47L5/38 (US);
A47L9/00 (EP,US);
A47L9/0027 (EP,US);
A47L9/0054 (EP,US);
A47L9/28 (US);
A47L9/2884 (EP,KR,US);
A47L9/325 (KR);
H01M10/44 (US);
H01M10/46 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (US);
H02J7/0044 (US);
H02J7/0045 (EP,US);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
A47L5/00 (US);
H02J7/0047 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REINIGERHALTER | [2023/19] | English: | CLEANER HOLDER | [2023/19] | French: | SUPPORT DE DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 14.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17796327.9 / EP3456236 | EP20185467.6 / EP3756521 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2014124443 (IRIS OHYAMA INC); | [A]WO2015129387 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al); | [A]CN105395132 (SUZHOU AIJIAN ELECTRIC APPLIANCE CO LTD) |