EP4378929 - SYNTHESIS OF AROMATIC BORONIC ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADAMA MAKHTESHIM LTD. P.O. Box 60 8410001 Beer Sheva / IL | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KISIN-FINFER, Einat 4531212 Hod Hasharon / IL | 02 /
FALLEK, Reut 6745801 Tel Aviv / IL | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22210257.6 | 29.11.2022 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4378929 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D201/00, C07D231/00, C07F5/02 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C07F5/025 (EP);
C07D201/00 (EP);
C07D213/82 (EP);
C07D231/00 (EP);
C07D231/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYNTHESE VON AROMATISCHEN BORONSÄUREN | [2024/23] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF AROMATIC BORONIC ACIDS | [2024/23] | French: | SYNTHÈSE D'ACIDES BORONIQUES AROMATIQUES | [2024/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP2016204636 [ ] (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [X]CN109761820 (UNIV ZHEJIANG TECHNOLOGY); | [X]CN109942433 (UNIV ZHEJIANG TECHNOLOGY); | by applicant | US5589493 | EP1490342 | EP1856055 | US2008183021 | US2011105766 | US8008232 | WO2018035685 | WO2021014437 |