EP4206379 - A WASHING MACHINE CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arçelik Anonim Sirketi Sutluce Karaagac Caddesi No: 2/6 Beyoglu 34445 Istanbul / TR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORENGUL, Hakan 34445 Istanbul / TR | 02 /
SAHIN, Umit 34445 Istanbul / TR | 03 /
SIR, Gokhan 34445 Istanbul / TR | 04 /
AYDOGAN, Egedem 34445 Istanbul / TR | 05 /
GURAN, Ali Kerem 34445 Istanbul / TR | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22210522.3 | 30.11.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | TR20210021822 | 30.12.2021 Original published format: TR 202121822 | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206379 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4206379 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D06F33/32, // D06F101/00, D06F105/00, D06F105/52 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
D06F33/32 (EP);
D06F2101/00 (EP);
D06F2105/00 (EP);
D06F2105/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/27] | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINENSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/27] | English: | A WASHING MACHINE CONTROL METHOD | [2023/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE MACHINE À LAVER | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/27] | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN105970547 (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD); | [XI]US2020248361 (BAE YONGGYUNG [KR], et al); | [XI]US10905304 (BEAUDET DOUGLAS B [US], et al); | [A]DE102019213656 (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US2016312396 |