EP4216607 - SEAMLESS ROAMING OF MULTI-RADIO STATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 01.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 01.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | 01.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.01.2024 [2024/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2023/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TADAHAL, Shivkumar 560100 Bangalore / IN | 02 /
KAMATH, Manoj Raveendranath 560100 Bangalore / IN | 03 /
NAGARAJAN, Jayaraman 560100 Bangalore / IN | 04 /
UPMANYU, Rohit 560100 Bangalore / IN | 05 /
DAMODARAN, Deepak Kumar 560100 Bangalore / IN | 06 /
SHARMA, Sreenath 560100 Bangalore / IN | 07 /
GUPTA, Raghvendra 560100 Bangalore / IN | 08 /
DASAM, Somaraju 560100 Bangalore / IN | 09 /
RAMANNA, Kumar 560100 Bangalore / IN | 10 /
KATIVARAPU, Samson 500032 Hyderabad / IN | [2023/30] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2023/30] | Application number, filing date | 22210569.4 | 30.11.2022 | [2023/30] | Priority number, date | US202217582712 | 24.01.2022 Original published format: US202217582712 | [2023/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4216607 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, // H04W84/12 | [2023/30] | CPC: |
H04W36/18 (EP,CN);
H04W36/0027 (CN);
H04W36/32 (US);
H04W12/06 (US);
H04W52/00 (US);
H04W8/12 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NAHTLOSES ROAMING EINER MEHRFUNKSTATION | [2023/30] | English: | SEAMLESS ROAMING OF MULTI-RADIO STATION | [2023/30] | French: | ITINÉRANCE SANS COUPURE DE STATION MULTIRADIO | [2023/30] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN111741500 (CHENGDU XGIMI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1,12-15 * Embodiment with reference to Figures 2-3 *; | [XI]WO2021154137 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 12,15 * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 17; figure 3 * * page 8, line 18 - page 10, line 8; figure 4 * * page 16, line 3 - page 18, line 4; figure 6 * * page 18, line 5 - page 19, line 24; figure 7 * * page 27, line 11 - page 28, line 30; figure 14 *[I] 1,13,14; | [X]WO2021238823 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,12-15 * Embodiments with reference to Figures 10, 11A-11B, 14, 15, 1 *; | [X]WO2022008079 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1,7,9,12-15 * page 19, line 16 - page 20, line 6; figures 4c, 4d, 4e, 4f, 4g *; | [P]US2022322162 (WU HAO [CN], et al) [P] * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0065]; figures 2-3 *; | EP4145947 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * paragraph [0115] - paragraph [0139]; figure 10 * * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0143]; figures 11A-11B * * paragraph [0157] - paragraph [0169]; figures 14-16 *; | [X] - GUOGANG HUANG (HUAWEI), "Tentative Re(Association) for Non-AP MLD", vol. 802.11 EHT; 802.11be, no. 9, (20200829), pages 1 - 23, IEEE DRAFT; 11-20-0834-09-00BE-TENTATIVE-RE-ASSOCIATION-FOR-NON-AP-MLD, IEEE-SA MENTOR, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: https://mentor.ieee.org/802.11/dcn/20/11-20-0834-09-00be-tentative-re-association-for-non-ap-mld.pptx, (20200829), XP068172365 [X] 1-6,8,10-15 * Slides 5 to 14 * |