EP4186797 - CONTROL SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INFLATABLE EVACUATION SLIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goodrich Corporation 4 Coliseum Centre 2730 West Tyvola Road Charlotte, NC 28217-4578 / US | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUGERAYA, Bhavik Bangalore / IN | 02 /
JOHN, Poly Puthur Trivandrum / IN | 03 /
PURUSHOTHAMAN, Srijith Bangalore / IN | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2023/22] | Application number, filing date | 22210595.9 | 30.11.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | IN202141055482 | 30.11.2021 Original published format: IN202141055482 | US202217590454 | 01.02.2022 Original published format: US202217590454 | [2023/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186797 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B64D25/14 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
B64D25/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN FÜR AUFBLASBARE EVAKUIERUNGSRUTSCHE | [2023/22] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR INFLATABLE EVACUATION SLIDE | [2023/22] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE POUR GLISSIÈRE D'ÉVACUATION GONFLABLE | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 30.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 30.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5052894 (RIMINGTON RICHARD M [GB]); | [XI]US2016107733 (THOMSON CHRISTIAN W [US]); | [XI]US2020094976 (JOHN POLY PUTHUR [IN], et al) |