EP4197949 - YARN WINDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | 20.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 22.11.2023 [2023/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3 Minami Ochiai-cho, Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2023/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASA, Yosuke Kyoto, 612-8686 / JP | [2023/25] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/25] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22210857.3 | 01.12.2022 | [2023/25] | Priority number, date | JP20210204504 | 16.12.2021 Original published format: JP 2021204504 | [2023/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4197949 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65H63/08 | [2023/25] | CPC: |
B65H63/082 (EP,CN);
B65H54/06 (CN);
B65H54/28 (CN);
B65H54/70 (CN);
B65H54/74 (CN);
B65H59/06 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] |
Former [2023/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GARNWICKELMASCHINE | [2023/25] | English: | YARN WINDING MACHINE | [2023/25] | French: | MACHINE DE BOBINAGE DE FIL | [2023/25] | Examination procedure | 13.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | 13.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]GB839368 (REINERS WALTER) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 5-21 * * page 3, lines 13-46; figure 7 * [Y] 6-8 [I] 4,5; | [Y]JPS61254473 (TEIJIN SEIKI CO LTD) [Y] 6-8* the whole document *; | [XYI]US2020024100 (NIE JIAN [CN], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 30] - [0037]; figures 2,3,5-7 * [Y] 8 [I] 3 | by applicant | JPH0485266 |