EP4194647 - POST FOR MOUNTING A FENCE PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 24.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | 24.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Forestia 2 Rue de la Carnoy 59130 Lambersart / FR | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINLEY, Melvyn 59840 Pérenchies / FR | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [2023/24] | Application number, filing date | 22210900.1 | 01.12.2022 | [2023/24] | Priority number, date | FR20210013076 | 07.12.2021 Original published format: FR 2113076 | [2023/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4194647 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04H17/14, E04H17/16 | [2023/24] | CPC: |
E04H17/17 (EP);
E04H17/1448 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] |
Former [2023/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFOSTEN ZUR MONTAGE EINER ZAUNTAFEL | [2023/24] | English: | POST FOR MOUNTING A FENCE PANEL | [2023/24] | French: | POTEAU POUR LE MONTAGE D'UN PANNEAU DE CLÔTURE | [2023/24] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 17.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]AU7287081 (CLEARLIGHT PTY LTD) [X] 1,2,16 * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 21; figures 1,2; claim 1 * [A] 3-15; | [XA]FR2971535 (ARCAL [FR]) [X] 1,2,16 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *[A] 3-15; | [XA]FR3074207 (SAUTEJEAU JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [X] 1,2,16 * figures 1,2,4,5; claim 1 * [A] 3-15 |