EP4378881 - MEMS PRESSURE TRANSDUCER CHIP WITH HYBRID INTEGRATED ENVIRONMENTAL BARRIER STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 20.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | 20.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG Am Campeon 1-15 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WASISTO, Hutomo Suryo 81541 München / DE | 02 /
FÜLDNER, Marc 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 03 /
MAIER, Dominic 92714 Pleystein / DE | 04 /
WIESBAUER, Andreas 9210 Poertschach / AT | 05 /
ANZINGER, Sebastian 83714 Miesbach / DE | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Hersina, Günter, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22210906.8 | 01.12.2022 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4378881 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B81B7/00 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
B81B7/0029 (EP);
B81B7/02 (CN,KR,US);
B81B3/0067 (KR);
B81B7/0061 (EP);
H01L24/48 (US);
H01L24/73 (US);
H04R19/00 (CN);
H04R31/00 (CN);
B81B2201/0257 (EP,US);
B81B2201/0264 (EP);
H01L2224/48137 (US);
H01L2224/73265 (US);
H01L2924/1461 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/30] |
Former [2024/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEMS-DRUCKWANDLERCHIP MIT HYBRIDER INTEGRIERTER UMWELTBARRIERESTRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2024/23] | English: | MEMS PRESSURE TRANSDUCER CHIP WITH HYBRID INTEGRATED ENVIRONMENTAL BARRIER STRUCTURE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2024/23] | French: | PUCE DE TRANSDUCTEUR DE PRESSION MEMS À STRUCTURE DE BARRIÈRE ENVIRONNEMENTALE INTÉGRÉE HYBRIDE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/23] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2024 | Examination requested [2024/30] | 18.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2012237073 (GOIDA THOMAS [US], et al); | [X]US2019145806 (LIM TONY K [US], et al); | [X]US2019215587 (KLEIN WOLFGANG [DE]); | [XA]US2022369042 (WESTMARLAND PAUL [GB], et al) |