EP4190658 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TuSimple, Inc. 9191 Towne Center Drive Suite 600 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bi, Haimo San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 02 /
Han, Xiaoling San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
Jing, Junbo San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 04 /
Kurt, Arda San Diego, CA 92122 / US | [2024/07] |
Former [2023/23] | 01 /
Bi, Haimo San Diego, CA 92122 / US | ||
02 /
Han, Xiaoling San Diego, CA92122 / US | |||
03 /
Jing, Junbo San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
04 /
Kurt, Arda San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Morrall, Jonathan Ian McLachlan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22211312.8 | 05.12.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | US202163286414P | 06.12.2021 Original published format: US 202163286414 P | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4190658 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4190658 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/14, B60W50/04, B60W50/14, B60W50/08, B60W60/00, B60W30/18 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B60W30/14 (EP);
B60W60/0053 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP);
B60W40/105 (US);
B60W50/04 (EP);
B60W50/045 (US);
B60W50/082 (EP);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
B60W60/0051 (EP);
B60W2050/0083 (US);
B60W2050/146 (EP,US);
B60W2300/145 (US);
B60W2510/0657 (US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2023/23] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING A VEHICLE | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016209841 (YAMAOKA MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [XI]US2019118831 (MIMURA YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]WO2021144081 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [A]US2021237775 (BIEG HANS-JOACHIM [DE]) |