EP4191051 - WAVE ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oscillating Wave Energy Limited Unit D2 Moneygourney Yard Douglas County Cork T12 ADT9 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | For all designated states Oscillating Wave Energy Limited Unit D2 Moneygourney Yard Douglas County Cork / IE | ||
Former [2023/23] | For all designated states Oscillating Wave Energy Limited Apartment 10 Steampacket House Passage West County Cork T12 YR24 / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAKOS, ISTVAN County Cork, T12 YR24 / IE | 02 /
BALOGH, BELA County Cork, P25 D620 / IE | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 22211468.8 | 05.12.2022 | [2023/23] | Priority number, date | IE2021S000205 | 06.12.2021 Original published format: IE S20210205 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4191051 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/20 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
F03B13/20 (EP);
F05B2240/917 (EP);
F05B2240/93 (EP);
F05B2260/406 (EP);
F05B2260/821 (EP);
F05B2270/18 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] |
Former [2023/23] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WELLENENERGIEUMWANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/23] | English: | WAVE ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICE | [2023/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONVERSION D'ÉNERGIE HOULOMOTRICE | [2023/23] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 07.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]KR20100068600 (KIM YONG SOO [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,6-11 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0014] - [0023] - [0034] - [0037]; figures 1-9 * [I] 5,12; | [XI]US2011042954 (WERJEFELT ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0017] - [0026]; figures 1,6,7,9 * [I] 5; | [XI]CN105257478B (UNIV SOUTH CHINA TECH) [X] 1,4,6,7 * paragraphs [0006] - [0019]; figure 1 * [I] 5; | [A]EP3889421 (INGINE INC [KR]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0004] - [0010]; figures 1,5 * |