EP4383308 - ELECTRON-OPTICAL STACK, MODULE, ASSESSMENT APPARATUS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRON-OPTICAL STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LANGEN, Johannes, Cornelis, Jacobus 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
LOOMAN, Bram, Albertus 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
MUDRETSOV, Dmitry 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 04 /
DEL TIN, laura 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22211495.1 | 05.12.2022 | [2024/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383308 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/04, H01J37/12 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
H01J37/04 (EP);
G01T1/242 (EP);
G01T1/244 (EP);
H01J37/12 (EP);
H01L31/028 (EP);
H01L31/115 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONENOPTISCHER STAPEL, MODUL, BEURTEILUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ELEKTRONENOPTISCHEN STAPELS | [2024/24] | English: | ELECTRON-OPTICAL STACK, MODULE, ASSESSMENT APPARATUS, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING AN ELECTRON-OPTICAL STACK | [2024/24] | French: | EMPILEMENT ELECTRO-OPTIQUE, MODULE, APPAREIL D'EVALUATION, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN EMPILEMENT ELECTRO-OPTIQUE | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014166894 (KATO TAKAHISA [US], et al); | [A]US2014197325 (KATO TAKAHISA [US], et al) | by applicant | EP1602121 | EP20200184160 | EP20210166214 | EP20210171877 |