EP4302928 - HAND-HELD, BATTERY-OPERATED TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 12.07.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | 12.07.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diehl, Heiko 73732 Esslingen / DE | 02 /
Böpple, Daniel 70329 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
Härtel, Alexander 71640 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Karzel, Philipp, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22211746.7 | 06.12.2022 | [2024/02] | Priority number, date | DE202210116975 | 07.07.2022 Original published format: DE102022116975 | [2024/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302928 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02, B27B17/00, A01G3/053, B24B27/08 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,CN,US);
B25F5/00 (CN);
A01G3/053 (EP,CN);
A01G3/085 (CN);
B24B27/08 (EP);
B27B17/0008 (EP);
H01M50/242 (CN);
H01M50/244 (CN);
H01M50/247 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/33] |
Former [2024/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTES, AKKUBETRIEBENES ARBEITSGERÄT | [2024/02] | English: | HAND-HELD, BATTERY-OPERATED TOOL | [2024/02] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAVAIL PORTATIF FONCTIONNANT SUR ACCUMULATEUR | [2024/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/33] | 08.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102009012178 (STIHL AG & CO KG ANDREAS [DE]); | [X]CN102416504 (ZHEJIANG YAT ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO LTD); | [X]SE1951341 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) |