EP4382254 - STRIKING MECHANISM FOR A HAND-HELD ELECTRIC TOOL AND HAND-HELD ELECTRIC TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Feldkircherstrasse 100 9494 Schaan / LI | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Britz, Rory 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Hilti Aktiengesellschaft Corporate Intellectual Property Feldkircherstrasse 100 Postfach 333 9494 Schaan / LI | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22211885.3 | 07.12.2022 | [2024/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4382254 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25D11/00, B25D17/06 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
B25D11/005 (EP);
B25D17/06 (EP);
B25D2211/068 (EP);
B25D2217/0019 (EP);
B25D2250/035 (EP);
B25D2250/131 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGWERK FÜR EIN HANDGEFÜHRTES ELEKTROWERKZEUG UND HANDGEFÜHRTES ELEKTROWERKZEUG | [2024/24] | English: | STRIKING MECHANISM FOR A HAND-HELD ELECTRIC TOOL AND HAND-HELD ELECTRIC TOOL | [2024/24] | French: | MÉCANISME DE PERCUSSION POUR UN OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE PORTATIF ET OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE PORTATIF | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0016949 (WACKER WERKE KG [DE], et al); | [XAI]EP1607187 (HILTI AG [LI]); | [XAI]EP1584420 (HILTI AG [LI]) | by applicant | DE3024715 | DE3040464 | DE8708167U | DE19714288 | US7926586 | DE102010029915 | DE102011105600 |