EP4238779 - TROLLEY FOR SEWER PIPE INSPECTION AND/OR RENOVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IBAK Robotics GmbH Schlosserstr. 22 76448 Durmersheim / DE | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gratz, Tobias 76474 Au am Rhein / DE | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf c/o lbmr. Patent- und Markenrecht Holtenauer Strasse 57 24105 Kiel / DE | [2023/36] | Application number, filing date | 22211927.3 | 07.12.2022 | [2023/36] | Priority number, date | DE202210103165 | 10.02.2022 Original published format: DE102022103165 | [2023/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238779 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4238779 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60B3/18, B08B9/04, B60B37/10, F16B21/18 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
B60B37/10 (EP);
B60B3/18 (EP);
B08B9/049 (EP);
B60B2310/306 (EP);
F16B21/186 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/36] | Title | German: | FAHRWAGEN FÜR DIE KANALROHRINSPEKTION UND/ODER -SANIERUNG | [2023/36] | English: | TROLLEY FOR SEWER PIPE INSPECTION AND/OR RENOVATION | [2023/36] | French: | CHARIOT POUR L'INSPECTION ET/OU LA RÉHABILITATION DE CANALISATIONS | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/36] | 20.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202015007064U (HEMA METALLBEARBEITUNG GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3628507 (GUNNERSBURY GLOBAL TRADE LTD [IE]); | [A]DE102020002327 (RAUSCH GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | DE202009003388U | EP2939848 |