EP4383017 - DEVICE FOR ARTICULATING TWO TIMEPIECE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROLEX SA 3-5-7 rue François Dussaud 1211 Genève 26 / CH | [2024/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTIAN, Martin 71290 Loisy / FR | 02 /
DUFOUR, Stéphane 1234 Vessy / CH | 03 /
RIOTTE, Thibaut 74370 Pringy / FR | 04 /
ROBIN, Jean-Baptiste 74100 Annemasse / FR | [2024/24] | Representative(s) | Moinas & Savoye SARL 27, rue de la Croix-d'Or 1204 Genève / CH | [2024/24] | Application number, filing date | 22212619.5 | 09.12.2022 | [2024/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4383017 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/14, A44C5/14, A44C5/02, A44C5/10 | [2024/24] | CPC: |
G04B37/1486 (EP);
A44C5/14 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GELENKVORRICHTUNG FÜR ZWEI UHRENKOMPONENTEN | [2024/24] | English: | DEVICE FOR ARTICULATING TWO TIMEPIECE COMPONENTS | [2024/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARTICULATION DE DEUX COMPOSANTS HORLOGERS | [2024/24] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2057914 (ROLEX SA [CH]); | [A]CH707779 (ETA SA MANUFACTURE HORLOGÈRE SUISSE [CH]); | [A]CH715977 (OMEGA SA [CH]) |