EP4170493 - RECALL SERVICE FOR PRODUCTIVITY APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aguilar-Gamez, Gama Redmond, 98052 / US | 02 /
Dvorkin, Igor Redmond, 98052 / US | 03 /
Tebbs, Matthew Redmond, 98052 / US | 04 /
Sood, Dhruv Redmond, 98052 / US | 05 /
Omar, Farheen Redmond, 98052 / US | 06 /
Brinkle, Jason Redmond, 98052 / US | 07 /
Syi, Julia Redmond, 98052 / US | 08 /
Schmidt, Mark Redmond, 98052 / US | 09 /
Ageeru, RajaniKanth Redmond, 98052 / US | 10 /
Hanley, Robert Redmond, 98052 / US | 11 /
Sandbakken, Taft Redmond, 98052 / US | 12 /
Tammana, Vihar Redmond, 98052 / US | 13 /
Rosu, Emanuel Redmond, 98052 / US | 14 /
Walaszek, Piotr Redmond, 98052 / US | 15 /
Rounthwaite, Robert Redmond, 98052 / US | 16 /
Karaeftimoglu, Evyenia R. Redmond, 98052 / US | 17 /
Mellers, James Redmond, 98052 / US | 18 /
Shuman, Andrew Redmond, 98052 / US | 19 /
Girling, Agnieszka Redmond, 98052 / US | 20 /
Kannepalli, Sreekanth Redmond, 98052 / US | 21 /
Williams, Ian Redmond, 98052 / US | 22 /
Kolonne, Nishadi Redmond, 98052 / US | 23 /
Pan, Bonnie Redmond, 98052 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 22213592.3 | 31.01.2017 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | US201662289757P | 01.02.2016 Original published format: US 201662289757 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170493 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4170493 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/48, G06F16/16 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
G06F16/168 (EP);
G06F3/0484 (US);
G06F16/10 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F9/451 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | RÜCKRUFDIENST FÜR PRODUKTIVITÄTSANWENDUNGEN | [2023/17] | English: | RECALL SERVICE FOR PRODUCTIVITY APPLICATIONS | [2023/17] | French: | SERVICE DE RAPPEL POUR APPLICATIONS DE PRODUCTIVITÉ | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17705524.1 / EP3411788 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XOI] - ZINSTALL, "Twinsplay", (20090904), COMPUTER PROGRAM, URL: http://www.twinsplay.com/, (20170606) [XO] 1-5,8-15 * The whole computer program and in particular the saving and restoring of work sessions * [I] 6,7 | [XO] - twinsplay, "twinsplay tutorial - productivity-oriented window and session manager", (20090603), page 1, URL: https://www.youtube.com/watch?v=0JmKJADZ1xY, (20170606) [XO] 1-15 * The complete video * | [L] - Cnet, "Twinsplay -Free download and software reviews -CNET Downloa", (20110629), URL: http://download.cnet.com/Twinsplay/3000-2383_4-10915608.html, (20170606), XP055378886 [L] * page 2 * * Cited to establish the release date of Twinsplay version 2.6.2 * |