EP4169709 - ULTRAVIOLET PROTECTIVE TRANSPARENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG Industries Ohio, Inc. 3800 West 143rd Street Cleveland, OH 44111 / US | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Maria Christina Sylmar, California, 91342 / US | 02 /
Wright, Brent Sylmar, California, 91342 / US | 03 /
Lakdawala, Khushroo Sylmar, California, 91342 / US | 04 /
Salisbury, Kyle Sylmar, California, 91342 / US | 05 /
Emami, Fateme Sadat Canyon Country, California, 91387 / US | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | f & e patent Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 22213710.1 | 20.11.2017 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | US201662425976P | 23.11.2016 Original published format: US 201662425976 P | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4169709 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C08J5/18, B64C1/14, F41H5/04, // C08K5/3475, C08K5/00 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B32B17/10651 (EP,US);
B32B17/10678 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10495 (EP);
B32B17/1077 (EP);
B64C1/1476 (EP);
C08G18/4236 (US);
C08G18/4858 (US);
C08G18/758 (US);
C08K5/3472 (US);
F41H5/0407 (EP);
B32B2307/4026 (EP);
B32B2571/02 (US);
B32B2605/006 (US);
B32B2605/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | UV-SCHUTZTRANSPARENZ | [2023/17] | English: | ULTRAVIOLET PROTECTIVE TRANSPARENCY | [2023/17] | French: | TRANSPARENT DE PROTECTION CONTRE LES ULTRAVIOLETS | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 24.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17818662.3 / EP3544811 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005243272 (MAINSTER MARTIN A [US], et al); | [Y]US2015036204 (BRANDA NEIL ROBIN [CA], et al); | [Y]US2015109651 (BRANDA NEIL ROBIN [CA], et al); | [X]WO2015093093 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [X]US2015246508 (OOTA YUUSUKE [JP], et al); | [XY]WO2015156273 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]US2015301367 (MENNIG JULIUS [FR]); | [X]US2015370094 (HASHIMOTO TOSHIYA [JP], et al); | [XY]US2016060160 (MACHIDA KEISUKE [JP], et al) |