EP4386424 - A RADIO DEVICE FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION AND RADAR SENSING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imec VZW Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bourdoux, Andre 4910 Theux / BE | 02 /
Wambacq, Pierre 1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE | 03 /
Gramegna, Giuseppe 06220 Golfe Juan / FR | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Patent Department IMEC IMEC vzw Patent Department Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22213734.1 | 15.12.2022 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4386424 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/00, G01S7/35 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G01S7/006 (EP,US);
G01S13/584 (US);
G01S13/86 (US);
G01S7/03 (US);
G01S7/352 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKVORRICHTUNG FÜR DRAHTLOSE KOMMUNIKATION UND RADARERFASSUNG | [2024/25] | English: | A RADIO DEVICE FOR WIRELESS COMMUNICATION AND RADAR SENSING | [2024/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF RADIO POUR COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET DÉTECTION RADAR | [2024/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN106817134B ; | [A]US2019361113 (RAY GARY A [US]); | [XI]CN111308462 (THE 55TH RESEARCH INSTITUTE OF CHINA ELECTRONICS TECH GROUP CORPORATION); |