EP4390321 - REDUCING WEAR ON PATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Autonomous Solutions AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIBERG, Wilhelm 436 39 Askim / SE | 02 /
LJUNGQVIST, Oskar 511 99 Sätila / SE | 03 /
SKILLSÄTER, Calle 644 36 Torshälla / SE | 04 /
SJÖBERG, Johan 722 19 Västerås / SE | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22214550.0 | 19.12.2022 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390321 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/34, B60W40/06 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G01C21/3492 (EP);
G01C21/34 (CN);
B60W60/0011 (US);
B60W40/06 (EP);
G01C21/3453 (EP);
B60W2530/10 (US);
B60W2552/35 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLEISSREDUZIERUNG AN PFADEN | [2024/26] | English: | REDUCING WEAR ON PATHS | [2024/26] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE L'USURE SUR DES TRAJETS | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014067265 (MASTON ROBERT A [US]); | [XI]DE102016215932 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) |