EP4390003 - A PURLIN, A ROOFING STRUCTURE AND A METHOD OF FORMING A ROOFING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KINGSPAN HOLDINGS (IRL) LIMITED Dublin Road Co Cavan Kingscourt / IE | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouid, Romain F-63200 Riom / FR | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22214684.7 | 19.12.2022 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390003 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04B7/02, E04B1/58, E04B1/24, E04C3/04 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
E04B7/022 (EP);
E04B7/024 (EP);
E04C3/07 (EP);
E04B2001/2469 (EP);
E04B2001/2487 (EP);
E04B2001/249 (EP);
E04C2003/0482 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DACHEINDECKUNG, DACHKONSTRUKTION UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DACHKONSTRUKTION | [2024/26] | English: | A PURLIN, A ROOFING STRUCTURE AND A METHOD OF FORMING A ROOFING STRUCTURE | [2024/26] | French: | PANNE, STRUCTURE DE TOITURE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UNE STRUCTURE DE TOITURE | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0132894 (REGOUT NV THOMAS [NL]); | [A]EP1327728 (PROFIL DU FUTUR SA [FR]); | [A]US2021388598 (GOSLING GEOFF WILLIAM [CA]) |