EP4203547 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RAPIDLY REPORTING FREQUENCY MEASUREMENT RESULTS IN NEXT GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Donggun 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
KIM, Soenghun 16677 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
JANG, Jaehyuk 16677 Suwon-si / KR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22214717.5 | 15.06.2018 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | KR20170076473 | 16.06.2017 Original published format: KR 20170076473 | KR20170101931 | 10.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170101931 | KR20170106288 | 22.08.2017 Original published format: KR 20170106288 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203547 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/10, H04W72/00, // H04W48/12 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
H04W24/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W28/0273 (US);
H04L69/04 (EP,US);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US);
H04W48/12 (EP,US);
H04W72/00 (KR);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/27 (US);
H04W80/02 (US);
H04W80/06 (US);
H04W84/02 (US);
H04W88/02 (US);
H04W88/08 (US);
H04W92/02 (US);
H04W92/10 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHNELLEN MELDUNG VON FREQUENZMESSERGEBNISSEN IN EINEM MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM DER NÄCHSTEN GENERATION | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR RAPIDLY REPORTING FREQUENCY MEASUREMENT RESULTS IN NEXT GENERATION MOBILE COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR RAPPORTER RAPIDEMENT DES RÉSULTATS DE MESURE DE FRÉQUENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE DE PROCHAINE GÉNÉRATION | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18816910.6 / EP3583799 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 30.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 30.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2024 | Decision despatched | 30.01.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.02.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2360960 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [Y] 3,6,10,13 * paragraph [0093] *; | [Y]US2012307669 (KIM SANG BUM [KR], et al) [Y] 3,6,10,13 * paragraph [0075]; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2014126472 (SIOMINA IANA [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0033] - [0067]; figure 3 * [Y] 3,6,10,13; | [A] - NSN ET AL, "Higher layer issues with MBSFN MDT measurements", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20140210 - 20140214, (20140209), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-140378_MDT HIGHER LAYER ISSUES, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20140209), XP050791764 [A] 4,7,11,14 * page 5 * |