EP4206505 - HEATING APPARATUS WITH A SAFETY DRAIN VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.08.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Termoteknik Isitma ve Klima Sanayi Ticaret Anonim Sirketi Organize Sanayi Boelgesi 45030 Manisa / TR | [2023/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ataman, Bartu 45030 Manisa / TR | 02 /
Kuzucanli, Seyit Ahmet 45030 Manisa / TR | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Bee, Joachim Robert Bosch GmbH, C/IPE P.O. Box 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/27] | Application number, filing date | 22214812.4 | 20.12.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | TR20210021448 | 28.12.2021 Original published format: TR 202121448 | [2023/27] | Filing language | TR | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4206505 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F16K15/06, F16K15/00, F24D19/08, F24D19/10 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
F24D19/088 (EP);
F16K2200/302 (EP);
F24D19/082 (EP);
F24D19/1009 (EP);
F24D19/1066 (EP);
F24D2220/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIZGERÄT MIT EINEM SICHERHEITSABLASSVENTIL | [2023/27] | English: | HEATING APPARATUS WITH A SAFETY DRAIN VALVE | [2023/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE CHAUFFAGE AVEC SOUPAPE DE DÉCHARGE DE SÉCURITÉ | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN107035902 (VATTI CO LTD); | [XI]EP3636969 (DANFOSS AS [DK]); | [A]DE202020004564U (ENTEGRIS INC [US]) |