EP4202772 - METHOD FOR DEVELOPING A CLASSIFICATION DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THALES Tour Carpe Diem Place des Corolles Esplanade Nord 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
du MAS des BOURBOUX, Hélion, Marie 91767 Palaiseau / FR | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22215295.1 | 21.12.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | FR20210014231 | 22.12.2021 Original published format: FR 2114231 | [2023/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202772 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/045, G06N3/047, G06N3/0475, G06N3/088, G06N3/09 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06N3/09 (EP);
G06N3/045 (EP);
G06N3/047 (EP);
G06N3/0475 (EP);
G06N3/088 (EP);
G06N3/0895 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FOKUSSIEREN EINER KLASSIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD FOR DEVELOPING A CLASSIFICATION DEVICE, METHOD AND SYSTEM THEREOF | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE AU POINT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE CLASSIFICATION, PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |