EP4209763 - SPECTRAL FILTER, AND IMAGE SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SPECTRAL FILTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 19.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | 19.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 16677 / KR | [2023/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Hyochul 16678 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Jaesoong 16678 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Roh, Younggeun 16678 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/28] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/28] | Application number, filing date | 22215532.7 | 21.12.2022 | [2023/28] | Priority number, date | KR20220002351 | 06.01.2022 Original published format: KR 20220002351 | [2023/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4209763 | Date: | 12.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01J3/12, G01J3/26, G02B5/28, H01L27/146, // G01J3/28 | [2023/28] | CPC: |
G01J3/2803 (EP);
G02B5/28 (KR);
G02B5/201 (EP,CN,US);
H04N25/13 (US);
G01J3/0297 (EP);
G01J3/12 (EP);
G01J3/26 (EP);
G01J3/2823 (KR);
G02B5/26 (US);
G02B5/284 (EP,CN);
H01L27/14621 (EP,CN);
H04N23/12 (KR);
G01J2003/1213 (EP);
G01J2003/1217 (EP);
G01J2003/1226 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/08] |
Former [2023/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEKTRALFILTER UND BILDSENSOR UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT DEM SPEKTRALFILTER | [2023/28] | English: | SPECTRAL FILTER, AND IMAGE SENSOR AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE INCLUDING THE SPECTRAL FILTER | [2023/28] | French: | FILTRE SPECTRAL, ET CAPTEUR D'IMAGE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT LE FILTRE SPECTRAL | [2023/28] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/08] | 12.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2015169761 (COMMISSARIAT L ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES ALTERNATIVES [FR]) [Y] 8-11,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * page 8, line 11 - line 19 * * page 22, paragraph l * * page 28, line 4 - line 5 *; | [Y]US2019016091 (LEE KYEONG SEOK [KR], et al) [Y] 8,9,14,15 * figure 33 * * paragraph [0085] *; | [Y]US2019244993 (YAMAGUCHI TETSUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * figures 6A-6C * * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0039] , [0040] , [0071] - [0075] *; | [Y]US2021372853 (BORREMANS JONATHAN [BE], et al) [Y] 8-11,14,15* paragraphs [0069] , [0071] *; | [Y]EP3933461 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * figures 13,23 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] , [0060] , [0109] - [0116] - [0121] - [0125] - [0160] , [0161] * |