EP4390284 - SUCTION OR DUST REMOVAL INSTALLATION OF METALLURGICAL INDUSTRIAL PLANTS AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SUCTION OR DUST REMOVAL INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Paul 4048 Puchenau / AT | 02 /
Weineis, Florian 4616 Weißkirchen a.d. Traun / AT | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22216049.1 | 22.12.2022 | [2024/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390284 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F27B1/26, F27B1/28, F27B3/28, F27B14/20, F27D21/00, B08B15/00, F27D19/00, // F27D21/02 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
B08B15/002 (EP);
F27B1/26 (EP);
F27B14/20 (EP);
F27B3/28 (EP);
F27D2019/0006 (EP);
F27D2019/0015 (EP);
F27D2021/026 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSAUG- ODER ENTSTAUBUNGSANLAGE VON METALLURGISCHEN INDUSTRIEANLAGEN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DER ABSAUG- ODER ENTSTAUBUNGSANLAGE | [2024/26] | English: | SUCTION OR DUST REMOVAL INSTALLATION OF METALLURGICAL INDUSTRIAL PLANTS AND A METHOD FOR OPERATING THE SUCTION OR DUST REMOVAL INSTALLATION | [2024/26] | French: | INSTALLATION D'ASPIRATION OU DE DÉPOUSSIÉRAGE D'INSTALLATIONS INDUSTRIELLES MÉTALLURGIQUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT DE L'INSTALLATION D'ASPIRATION OU DE DÉPOUSSIÉRAGE | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010208765 (CARLSON CHRISTOPHER [US], et al); | [XI]EP3748267 (PRIMETALS TECHNOLOGIES AUSTRIA GMBH [AT]) |