EP4205819 - INERTING INTERMITTENT SUPPRESSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kidde-Fenwal, LLC 400 Main Street Ashland, MA 01721 / US | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/27] | For all designated states Carrier Corporation 13995 Pasteur Blvd. Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLIEM, John Ashland, 01721 / US | [2023/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/27] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22216231.5 | 22.12.2022 | [2023/27] | Priority number, date | US202263296337P | 04.01.2022 Original published format: US 202263296337 P | [2023/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4205819 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A62C37/36, A62C37/00, A62C3/16, // A62C99/00 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
A62C37/00 (EP,CN);
A62C37/44 (US);
A62C3/00 (US);
A62C3/16 (EP);
A62C31/005 (CN);
A62C37/36 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] |
Former [2023/27] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INERTISIERUNGSSYSTEM MIT INTERMITTIERENDER UNTERDRÜCKUNG | [2023/27] | English: | INERTING INTERMITTENT SUPPRESSION SYSTEM | [2023/27] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INERTAGE À SUPPRESSION INTERMITTENTE | [2023/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/07] | 05.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2253576 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE) [X] 1-6,9-12 * the whole document * [A] 7,8,13-15; | [XA]DE2532163 (VERBAND DER SACHVERSICHERER E) [X] 1-6,9-12 * the whole document *[A] 7,8,13-15; | [XI]US2012031634 (LEWINSKI DANIEL F [US], et al) [X] 1-6,9-12 * figure - * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0059] * [I] 7,8,13-15; | [XI]WO2020245725 (TYCO FIRE PRODUCTS LP [US]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * figure - * * claims 1,3,4,6,7,8 * [I] 7,8,13-15 |