EP4389809 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DEPOLYMERIZING POLYCONDENSATION POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sipchem InnoVent SA Route de Lavaux 35 1095 Lutry / CH | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Cyril 1772 Grolley / CH | 02 /
ARPIN, Thierry 6984 Pura / CH | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22216286.9 | 23.12.2022 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4389809 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/16, C08J11/24 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
C08J11/24 (EP);
C08J11/16 (EP);
C08J2367/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEPOLYMERISATION VON POLYKONDENSATIONSPOLYMEREN | [2024/26] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DEPOLYMERIZING POLYCONDENSATION POLYMERS | [2024/26] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉPOLYMÉRISATION DE POLYMÈRES DE POLYCONDENSATION | [2024/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2016101938 (VYSOKÉ UČENI TECHNICKÉ V BRNĚ [CZ]); | [A]CA3105155 (9449710 CANADA INC [CA]); | [A]WO2022159040 (UNIV NANYANG TECH [SG]) | by applicant | EP0875504 | WO2021180432 |