EP4393528 - FLEXIBLE BAG FOR DIALYSIS CONCENTRATES WITH SEALED OVERPOUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gambro Lundia AB Magistratsvägen 16 226 43 Lund / SE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vartia, Christian, Antero SE 24764 Veberöd / SE | 02 /
Dioos, Bart, Michiel 3050 Oud-Heverlee / BE | 03 /
Dendal, Frédéric, Eugène, Louis 1040 Etterbeek / BE | 04 /
Lin, Rongsheng Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22217236.3 | 29.12.2022 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393528 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16, A61J1/10 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61M1/1668 (EP);
A61J1/10 (EP);
A61J1/16 (EP);
A61M1/287 (EP);
A61M2209/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER BEUTEL FÜR DIALYSEKONZENTRATE MIT VERSIEGELTER ÜBERBEUTELUNG | [2024/27] | English: | FLEXIBLE BAG FOR DIALYSIS CONCENTRATES WITH SEALED OVERPOUCH | [2024/27] | French: | POCHE SOUPLE POUR CONCENTRES DE DIALYSE A SURPOUCHES SCELLEES | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5364384 (GRABENKORT RICHARD W [US], et al); | [XI]US2015298888 (KUHN BERND [DE], et al); | [A]US2022151870 (ADAMO VINCENT [CH], et al) | by applicant | EP0733472 | EP0738589 | WO2004066857 | WO2006116287 |