EP4395202 - COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR A WIRELESS AD HOC NETWORK, AND WIRELESS AD HOC NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baessler, Andreas 81671 München / DE | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22217387.4 | 30.12.2022 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395202 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155, H04L45/00, H04W84/18, H04W52/02 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04B7/15528 (EP);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04B7/2643 (US);
H04L47/16 (EP);
H04L47/28 (EP);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
H04W52/0229 (EP);
H04W52/0254 (EP);
H04W52/0258 (EP);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR EIN DRAHTLOSES AD-HOC-NETZWERK UND DRAHTLOSES AD-HOC-NETZWERK | [2024/27] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD FOR A WIRELESS AD HOC NETWORK, AND WIRELESS AD HOC NETWORK | [2024/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION POUR UN RÉSEAU AD HOC SANS FIL, ET RÉSEAU AD HOC SANS FIL | [2024/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2013315078 (BROWN THOMAS A [US], et al); | [A]US2016374039 (KHORYAEV ALEXEY [RU], et al); | [IA]US2018102876 (JOHNSON MARK [US]); | [A]EP4061057 (BEIJING XIAOMI MOBILE SOFTWARE CO LTD [CN]); |