EP4254859 - METHOD FOR ENROLLING A PUBLIC KEY ON A SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thales Dis France SAS 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTIN, Alain 78860 Saint Nom la Bretèche / FR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Grevin, Emmanuel Thales Dis France SAS Intellectual Property Department Avenue du Jujubier, Z.I. Athélia IV 13705 La Ciotat / FR | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22305390.1 | 28.03.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254859 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/32, H04L9/40 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04L63/0823 (EP);
H04L9/3263 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REGISTRIEREN EINES ÖFFENTLICHEN SCHLÜSSELS AUF EINEM SERVER | [2023/40] | English: | METHOD FOR ENROLLING A PUBLIC KEY ON A SERVER | [2023/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INSCRIPTION D'UNE CLÉ PUBLIQUE SUR UN SERVEUR | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5790677 (FOX BARBARA L [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 5 - column 1, line 10 * * column 2, line 23 - column 2, line 41 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 6 * * column 8, line 26 - column 8, line 46 * * column 22, line 46 - column 23, line 48 * * figures 1, 2, 17, 18 * * column 25, line 32 - column 25, line 42 *; | [A]EP3288214 (CHOI UNHO [KR]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0015] , [0029] - [0031] - [0054] , [0058] - [0060] - [0068] - [0070] - [0075] ** figures 1A, 1B, 4A, 4B * |