EP4283267 - CROSS-BONDING BOX INTEGRITY MONITORING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.10.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 4, Allée de l'Arche 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASPARI, Roberto 1182 Oslo / NO | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22305780.3 | 25.05.2022 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4283267 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01K1/02, G01K1/16, G01K1/20, G01K3/00, G01K3/14, H01R9/00, H02G3/00, H02G15/00, G01K1/143 | [2023/48] | CPC: |
G01K1/16 (EP);
G01K1/026 (EP);
G01K1/143 (EP);
G01K1/20 (EP);
G01K3/005 (EP);
G01K3/14 (EP);
H02G3/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] |
Former [2023/48] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG DER INTEGRITÄT VON CROSS-BONDING-BOXEN | [2023/48] | English: | CROSS-BONDING BOX INTEGRITY MONITORING | [2023/48] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE L'INTÉGRITÉ DE BOÎTIER DE LIAISON CROISÉE | [2023/48] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 29.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO2016008542 (PRYSMIAN SPA [IT]) [X] 1-5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0013] , [0014] , [0045] , [0053] - [0055]; figure 3 * [A] 11-15 [I] 6-10; | [A]US2017313160 (ECKERT DANIEL [DE], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0003] , [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE202021103459U (ABB SCHWEIZ AG [CH]) [A] 6-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] - [0014]; figure 2 * | by applicant | WO2019157619 | EP3910306 |