EP4293904 - AMPLITUDE LIMITING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING CHAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L-Acoustics Parc de la Fontaine de Jouvence 13, rue Levacher Cintrat 91462 Marcoussis Cedex / FR | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWANN, Robert 58511 Luedenscheid / DE | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22305859.5 | 13.06.2022 | [2023/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293904 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H03G3/30, H03G7/00, H03G11/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
H03G3/3089 (EP);
H03G11/008 (EP);
H03G7/007 (EP);
H03G2201/106 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR AMPLITUDENBEGRENZUNG FÜR SIGNALVERARBEITUNGSKETTEN | [2023/51] | English: | AMPLITUDE LIMITING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SIGNAL PROCESSING CHAIN | [2023/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIMITATION D'AMPLITUDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE CHAÎNE DE TRAITEMENT DE SIGNAL | [2023/51] | Examination procedure | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 13.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2369852 (HARMAN INT IND [US]) [X] 1,5-7,14,15 * paragraph [0055]; figures 1,3,6,7 *; | [X]US2015086025 (OYETUNJI SAMUEL [US]) [X] 1,14,15 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2015207471 (PLAGER JOSEF [DE], et al) [X] 1,14,15* figures 1,2c *; | [X]US2015372650 (THORMUNDSSON TRAUSTI [US], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * figures 8-10 *; | [XI]US2018103313 (DOY TONY [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0021] , [0037] , [0073] - [0078]; figures 2,6-9 * [I] 3-7,11 |