EP4300955 - ENCODING/DECODING VIDEO PICTURE DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beijing Xiaomi Mobile Software Co., Ltd. No. 018, Floor 8, Building 6, Yard 33 Middle Xierqi Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRIVON, Pierre 35340 LIFFRE / FR | 02 /
LE LEANNEC, Fabrice 35830 BETTON / FR | 03 /
RADOSAVLJEVIC, Milos 35000 RENNES / FR | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | RVDB Rennes 44 rue Lariboisière 35235 Thorigné-Fouillard / FR | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22305945.2 | 29.06.2022 | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4300955 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/11, H04N19/157, H04N19/593, H04N19/176 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP);
H04N19/157 (EP);
H04N19/176 (EP);
H04N19/593 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] |
Former [2024/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CODIEREN/DECODIEREN VON VIDEOBILDDATEN | [2024/01] | English: | ENCODING/DECODING VIDEO PICTURE DATA | [2024/01] | French: | CODAGE/DÉCODAGE DE DONNÉES D'IMAGES VIDÉO | [2024/01] | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 06.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2020154100 (ZHAO XIN [US], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8,11-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0224] * * figures 1-17 * [A] 4 [Y] 7,9 [I] 2,3,10; | [XAYI]US2021112263 (CHOI JANGWON [KR]) [X] 1,5,6,8,11-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0146] * * figures 1-8 * [A] 4 [Y] 7,9 [I] 2,3,10; | [Y] - LI (ALIBABA-INC) X ET AL, "Non-EE2: On chroma intra prediction mode", no. JVET-Y0092, (20220105), 25. JVET MEETING; 20220112 - 20220121; TELECONFERENCE; (THE JOINT VIDEO EXPLORATION TEAM OF ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 AND ITU-T SG.16 ),, URL: https://jvet-experts.org/doc_end_user/documents/25_Teleconference/wg11/JVET-Y0092-v1.zip JVET-Y0092-v1.docx, (20220105), XP030300342 [Y] 7,9 * page 1 - page 4 * |