EP4310393 - INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICITY OR MECHANICAL POWER, COMPRISING A COMBINED CYCLE GAS TURBINE, AND CO2 CAPTURE AND WATER ELECTROLYSIS UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TotalEnergies OneTech La Défense 6 2 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIT BENGRIR, Idar 03700 BELLERIVE SUR ALLIER / FR | 02 /
HACHEM, Joe 78000 VERSAILLES / FR | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/04] | Application number, filing date | 22306075.7 | 20.07.2022 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4310393 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F22B1/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
F22B1/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUM PRODUZIEREN VON ELEKTRIZITÄT ODER MECHANISCHER ENERGIE, DIE EINE GASTURBINE MIT KOMBINIERTEM ZYKLUS UND CO2-ABSCHLUSS- UND WASSERELEKTROLYSEEINHEITEN UMFASST | [2024/04] | English: | INSTALLATION FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICITY OR MECHANICAL POWER, COMPRISING A COMBINED CYCLE GAS TURBINE, AND CO2 CAPTURE AND WATER ELECTROLYSIS UNITS | [2024/04] | French: | INSTALLATION POUR PRODUIRE DE L'ÉLECTRICITÉ OU DE L'ÉNERGIE MÉCANIQUE, COMPRENANT UNE TURBINE À GAZ À CYCLE COMBINÉ, ET CAPTURE DE CO2 ET UNITÉS D'ÉLECTROLYSE DE L'EAU | [2024/04] | Examination procedure | 14.08.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU2010362092 (SILICON FIRE AG) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0094] - [0107] *; | [A]WO2021205011 (TECHNIP FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 16 * * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 18 * * page 19, lines 2-4 * * page 20, lines 5-15 * * page 21, lines 1-7 * * page 21, line 25 - page 23, line 6 *; | [A]US2022065162 (HUNT DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0 19] , [0 22] - [0024] - [0 27] - [0031] - [0 63] - [0071] - [0 74] - [0083] - [0 88] - [0099] * |