EP4119134 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR USE IN INHIBITING THE INFECTIVITY OF BILAYER VIRUSES, TO TREAT ASSOCIATED DISEASES AND THEIR COMPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Change - priority | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monkam Nitcheu, Guy Faustin Résidence les Clos d'Acajou B32 97232 Le Lamentin / MQ | [2023/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | Sach, Greg Robert Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 22315076.4 | 25.03.2022 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | deleted | [2024/17] |
Former [2023/03] | FR20210003144 | 27.03.2021 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119134 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/015, A61K31/045, A61K31/11, A61K31/12, A61K31/353, A61K31/575, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P31/12, A61P31/14, A61P31/16, A61P31/18, A61P35/00 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/015 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/56 (CN,US);
A61K31/045 (EP);
A61K31/11 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,CN);
A61K31/353 (EP,CN);
A61K31/575 (EP,CN);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P29/00 (CN);
A61P3/04 (CN);
A61P3/06 (EP,CN);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN);
A61P31/04 (CN);
A61P31/12 (EP,CN);
A61P31/14 (EP,CN);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (CN);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/015, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/045, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/11, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (CN,EP);
A61K31/353, A61K2300/00 (EP,CN);
A61K31/56, A61K2300/00 (CN); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR HEMMUNG DER INFEKTIOSITÄT VON LIPID-DOPPELSCHICHTVIREN, ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DAMIT VERBUNDENEN KRANKHEITEN UND DEREN KOMPLIKATIONEN | [2023/03] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITION FOR USE IN INHIBITING THE INFECTIVITY OF BILAYER VIRUSES, TO TREAT ASSOCIATED DISEASES AND THEIR COMPLICATIONS | [2023/03] | French: | COMPOSITION PHARMACEUTIQUE DESTINÉE À INHIBER L'INFECTIOSITÉ DES VIRUS À BICOUCHE LIPIDIQUE, À TRAITER LES MALADIES ASSOCIÉES ET LEURS COMPLICATIONS | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 12.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 12.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 04.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2022 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 04.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.12.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0826980 (TSUMURA & CO); | [Y]WO2012130893 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al); | [Y]WO2018127748 (MONKAM NITCHEU GUY FAUSTIN [FR]); | [Y]EP3785709 (MONKAM NITCHEU GUY FAUSTIN [FR]); |