EP4390497 - A METHOD OF COMBINING IMAGES OF A SAMPLE FROM DIFFERENT DIGITAL IMAGING DEVICES AND AN ASSOCIATED SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HyprView 17 rue Claude Bloch Centre d'Innovation Technologique 14076 Caen Cedex 5 / FR | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Auvray, François Caen / FR | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF SAS Chez Regus - Rennes Cesson 2 rue Claude Chappe 35510 Cesson Sévigné / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2024/26] | HGF HGF SAS Chez Regus - Rennes Cesson Rue Claude Chappe 35510 Cesson Sévigné / FR | Application number, filing date | 22315340.4 | 20.12.2022 | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4390497 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/06, G02B21/10, G02B21/12, G02B21/14, G02B21/36 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
G02B21/367 (EP);
G02B21/06 (EP);
G02B21/10 (EP);
G02B21/12 (EP);
G02B21/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KOMBINIEREN VON BILDERN EINER PROBE AUS VERSCHIEDENEN DIGITALEN BILDGEBUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES SYSTEM | [2024/26] | English: | A METHOD OF COMBINING IMAGES OF A SAMPLE FROM DIFFERENT DIGITAL IMAGING DEVICES AND AN ASSOCIATED SYSTEM | [2024/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMBINAISON D'IMAGES D'UN ÉCHANTILLON PROVENANT DE DIFFÉRENTS DISPOSITIFS D'IMAGERIE NUMÉRIQUE ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | [2024/26] | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/26] | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2024/26] | 28.02.2023 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 13.03.2023 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4710875 (NAKAJIMA NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012302880 (TIAN JIE [CN], et al); | [IY]US2013204126 (NAMATI EMAN [US], et al); | [IY]EP2777486 (LIGHTLAB IMAGING INC [US]); | [Y]US2020294763 (CHANG YUN-CHING [US]); | [Y]US2022054011 (RAGATZ ANDREW [US], et al); |