EP4269899 - CONTROLLED MECHANICAL VENTILATION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.07.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Soler & Palau Research, S.L. C/Llevant, 4-Pol. Ind. Llevant 08150 Parets del Vallès (Barcelona) / ES | [2024/31] |
Former [2023/44] | For all designated states Soler & Palau Research, S.L. c/Llevant, 4-Pol. Ind. Llevant 08150 Parets del Vallés (Barcelona) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACH-ESTEVE BURCH, ALBERT 08150 PARETS DEL VALLÈS (BARCELONA) / ES | 02 /
FAIG DURAN, JULI 08150 PARETS DEL VALLÈS (BARCELONA) / ES | 03 /
SUMARROCA VERGE, MARTÍ 08150 PARETS DEL VALLÈS (BARCELONA) / ES | [2023/44] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/44] | Application number, filing date | 22382399.8 | 27.04.2022 | [2023/44] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4269899 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/02, F24F13/20, F24F7/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
F24F13/0236 (EP);
F24F13/20 (EP);
F24F2007/002 (EP);
F24F2013/205 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GESTEUERTE MECHANISCHE LÜFTUNGSEINHEIT | [2023/44] | English: | CONTROLLED MECHANICAL VENTILATION UNIT | [2023/44] | French: | UNITÉ DE VENTILATION MÉCANIQUE CONTRÔLÉE | [2023/44] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/44] | 17.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]FR2581740 (ALDES [FR]); | [XI]US2011237175 (BUSEYNE SERGE [FR], et al); | [A]EP2743597 (VERO DUCO NV [BE]); | [XI]EP2811234 (SOLER & PALAU RES SL [ES]) |