EP4147989 - POWDERED FOOD CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITC Packaging, S.L.U. Poligono Industrual Retiro Casa Nova C/ Valladolid, 8 03440 Ibi (Alicante) / ES | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Galera Sánchez, Pedro Ibi (Alicante) / ES | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Ballester Cañizares, Rosalia Ballester Intellectual Property SLP Avda. de la Constitución 16, 1º D 03002 Alicante / ES | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 22382405.3 | 27.04.2022 | [2023/11] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147989 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D43/16, B65D51/24 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
B65D43/163 (EP);
B65D51/246 (EP);
B65D2215/04 (EP);
B65D2251/105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR PULVERFÖRMIGE LEBENSMITTEL | [2023/11] | English: | POWDERED FOOD CONTAINER | [2023/11] | French: | EMBALLAGE POUR ALIMENTS EN POUDRE | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 30.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006096984 (BANDOH TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US7243816 (AOCHI YASUMITSU [JP]); | [X]WO2013163583 (ABBOTT LAB [US]); | [XY]US2015210444 (MERCADO GRACE [SG], et al); | [XAI]US2018334297 (DE WILDE VINCENT HUBERT M [BE], et al); | [XY]US10513377 (LENZ FRANZ [DE], et al) | by applicant | ES2426188T |